California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1433 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 12, 2016

Amended

Bill May 31, 2016
Bill April 7, 2016
Bill March 30, 2016