California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1436 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 5, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 22, 2016

Amended

Bill April 6, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016