Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2016 | May 11 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2016 | Set for hearing May 11. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | April 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2016 | Set for hearing April 27. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2016 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |