|
11/30/2016
|
Died on the inactive file.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2016
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate. Withdrawn from engrossing and enrolling. Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Hertzberg.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5780.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2016
|
Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4059.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4011.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2016
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3520.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2016
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
April 5 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2016
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2016
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|