Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From Assembly without further action. | ||
Assembly | 11/30/2016 | Died on the inactive file. | ||
Assembly | 06/16/2016 | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. Ordered to inactive file. | ||
Assembly | 06/13/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2016 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8). | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2016 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2016 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2016 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3463.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2016 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3394.) (April 5). | ||
Senate | 03/28/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2016 | Set for hearing April 5. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |