|
09/12/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 312, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5141.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5780.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3737.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3670.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2016
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3517.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2016
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|