Senate | 11/30/2016 | Died on the inactive file. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2016 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Monning. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2016 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2016 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 15. Noes 18. Page 3923.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Morrell. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3924.) | ||
Senate | 04/20/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 4. Page 3608.) (April 20). | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | Set for hearing April 20. (For vote only) | ||
Senate | 04/18/2016 | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2016 | March 30 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 4. Noes 4. Page 3333.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2016 | Set for hearing March 30. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2016 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |