Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From Assembly without further action. | ||
Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2016 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2016 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2016 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 4035.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4011.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2016 | Set for hearing May 27. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2016 | April 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2016 | Set for hearing April 18. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2016 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2016 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3333.) (March 30). | ||
Senate | 03/11/2016 | Set for hearing March 30. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2016 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |