|
09/26/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 679, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 3. Page 6270.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2016
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 5. Page 4060.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4011.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3645.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|