Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2016 | May 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2016 | Set for hearing May 27. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2016 | May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2016 | Set for hearing May 2. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3609.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2016 | Set for hearing April 19. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | April 5 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2016 | Set for hearing April 5. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2016 | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |