California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB147 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 28, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2015

Amended

Bill August 31, 2015
Bill August 17, 2015
Bill July 8, 2015
Bill April 21, 2015
Bill April 7, 2015