Senate | 11/30/2016 | Died on the inactive file. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2016 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Mendoza. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2016 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2016 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4011.) (May 27). | ||
Senate | 05/24/2016 | Set for hearing May 27. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2016 | May 23 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2016 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 3617.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2016 | Set for hearing April 19. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |