California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1473 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 29, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2016

Amended

Bill August 11, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill March 30, 2016