|
08/19/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 158, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/10/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2016
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5721.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2016
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3776.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2016
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2016
|
April 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2016
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 3494.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2016
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|