|
09/27/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 733, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5491.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6243.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5976.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
Withdrawn from engrossing and enrolling. Ordered held at the Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2016
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5487.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3630.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3560.) (April 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|