|
09/25/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 634, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5497.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6010.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3850.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3592.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2016
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2016
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|