|
10/02/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 448, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2503.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 2487.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2442.) Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2813.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1330.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1148.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
April 27 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
April 20 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 417.) (March 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Set for hearing March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|