Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
August 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1243.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1148.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 757.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
April 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2015
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|