Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 09/08/2015 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 09/04/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2015 | May 12 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2015 | Set for hearing May 12. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2015 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |