Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
Died on third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5947.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2015
|
June 23 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1071.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 985.) (May 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 795.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Re-referred to Coms. on G.O. and V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|