|
07/02/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 44, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2090.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 842.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 727.) (April 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
April 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2015
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|