LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB165
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB165
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB165
Compare Versions
SB165 Chaptered August 7, 2015
SB165 Enrolled July 27, 2015
SB165 Amended April 14, 2015
SB165 Amended March 12, 2015
SB165 Introduced February 4, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB165 Chaptered August 7, 2015
SB165 Enrolled July 27, 2015
SB165 Amended April 14, 2015
SB165 Amended March 12, 2015
SB165 Introduced February 4, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare