Assembly | 09/10/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. | ||
Assembly | 09/10/2015 | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. Joint Rule 61(a) suspended. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3102.) Art. IV. Sec. 8(b) of the Constitution dispensed with. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3103.) | ||
Assembly | 08/31/2015 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/31/2015 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2277.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/27/2015 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/27/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2235.) (August 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 08/25/2015 | Set for hearing August 27 in APPR. pending receipt. | ||
Senate | 08/25/2015 | Set for hearing August 27. | ||
Senate | 08/24/2015 | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. | ||
Senate | 08/24/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 08/18/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 08/17/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |