|
08/07/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 136, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/30/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2431.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 743.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1702.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 523.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2015
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/02/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|