Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 01/12/2016 | January 12 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 12/10/2015 | Set for hearing January 12. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2015 | May 12 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2015 | Set for hearing May 12. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | April 28 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2015 | Set for hearing April 28. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |