California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB172 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 5, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2015

Amended

Bill September 4, 2015
Bill September 1, 2015
Bill July 9, 2015
Bill June 23, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015