LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB173
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB173
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB173
Action History
Senate
02/01/2016
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Senate
03/24/2015
March 24 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 7. Page 405.) Reconsideration granted.
Senate
03/17/2015
Set for hearing March 24.
Senate
02/19/2015
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
Senate
02/06/2015
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8.
Senate
02/05/2015
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.