Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2015 | May 28 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2015 | Set for hearing May 28. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | April 20 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2015 | Set for hearing April 20. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2015 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 416.) (March 24). | ||
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Set for hearing March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2015 | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |