LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB178
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB178
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB178
Compare Versions
SB178 Chaptered October 8, 2015
SB178 Enrolled September 10, 2015
SB178 Amended September 4, 2015
SB178 Amended August 28, 2015
SB178 Amended August 17, 2015
SB178 Amended July 7, 2015
SB178 Amended June 24, 2015
SB178 Amended June 2, 2015
SB178 Amended April 22, 2015
SB178 Amended March 16, 2015
SB178 Introduced February 9, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB178 Chaptered October 8, 2015
SB178 Enrolled September 10, 2015
SB178 Amended September 4, 2015
SB178 Amended August 28, 2015
SB178 Amended August 17, 2015
SB178 Amended July 7, 2015
SB178 Amended June 24, 2015
SB178 Amended June 2, 2015
SB178 Amended April 22, 2015
SB178 Amended March 16, 2015
SB178 Introduced February 9, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare