06/01/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 4, Statutes of 2015. | |||
06/01/2015 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2015 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1565.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2015 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 13). | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2015 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2015 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 636.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 523.) (April 8). | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Set for hearing April 8. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2015 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |