|
09/03/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 256, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2635.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2015
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2015
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Cristina Garcia.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Maienschein.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 636.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 524.) (April 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|