LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB185
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB185
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB185
Compare Versions
SB185 Chaptered October 8, 2015
SB185 Enrolled September 3, 2015
SB185 Amended June 2, 2015
SB185 Amended April 8, 2015
SB185 Amended March 25, 2015
SB185 Introduced February 9, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB185 Chaptered October 8, 2015
SB185 Enrolled September 3, 2015
SB185 Amended June 2, 2015
SB185 Amended April 8, 2015
SB185 Amended March 25, 2015
SB185 Introduced February 9, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare