|
09/04/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 270, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2015
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 6. Page 2529.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (July 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 4. Page 995.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 884.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 727.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 524.) (April 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|