Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
August 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2015
|
August 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 14. Page 1298.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1149.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
April 27 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 649.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 506.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|