|
10/05/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 504, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2671.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 64. Noes 11. Page 2968.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 67. Noes 10. Page 2791.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1299.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1145.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 817.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 544.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/02/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|