Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From Assembly without further action. | ||
Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 07/01/2015 | July 1 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/11/2015 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2015 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2015 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1294.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2015 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2015 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1149.) (May 28). | ||
Senate | 05/23/2015 | Set for hearing May 28. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2015 | April 27 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2015 | Set for hearing April 27. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | April 20 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Set for hearing April 20. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 349.) (March 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2015 | Set for hearing March 18. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |