BILL NUMBER: SB 192AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 30, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 20, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 9, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Senator Liu FEBRUARY 10, 2015 An act to add and repeal Section 21212.5 of the Vehicle Code, relating to bicycles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 192, as amended, Liu. Bicycles: helmets. Existing law prohibits a person under 18 years of age from operating a bicycle, riding on a bicycle as a passenger, or riding in a trailer towed by a bicycle unless the person is wearing a bicycle helmet meeting specified standards. A violation of those provisions is an infraction punishable by a fine of not more than $25. This bill would require the Office of Traffic Safety, in coordination with the Department of the California Highway Patrol, to conduct a comprehensive study of bicycle helmet use, including specified information, and to report the study's findingsto the Senate Committee on Transportation and Housing and the Assembly Committee on Transportation by January 1, 2017.by January 1, 2017, as specified. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 21212.5 is added to the Vehicle Code, to read: 21212.5. (a) The Office of Traffic Safety, in coordination with the department, shall conduct a comprehensive study of bicycle helmet use, including, but not limited to, determining the percentage of California bicyclists who do not wear helmets, and the fatalities or serious injuries that could have been avoided if helmets had been worn. A report of the study's findings shall be submittedto the Senate Committee on Transportation and Housing and the Assembly Committee on Transportationin compliance with Section 9795 of the Government Code, by January 1, 2017.(b) Pursuant to Section 10231.5 of the Government Code, this section is repealed on January, 1, 2021.(b) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2018, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2018, deletes or extends that date.