Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
Died on the inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/10/2016
|
August 10 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2015
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 15. Page 1213.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1145.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
April 27 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 648.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2015
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 405.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Set for hearing March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/02/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|