Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | April 29 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 860.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Set for hearing April 29. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | April 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2015 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |