Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From Assembly without further action. | ||
Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2015 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2015 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 843.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2015 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2015 | Set for hearing April 27. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 649.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Set for hearing April 15. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | March 18 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Set for hearing March 18. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2015 | Referred to Com. on E.Q. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |