|
10/09/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 675, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2720.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
July 15 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 1248.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1149.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
April 27 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 649.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2015
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 406.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Set for hearing March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|