California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB21 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2015

Amended

Bill August 26, 2015
Bill August 17, 2015