LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB210
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB210
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB210
Compare Versions
SB210 Chaptered October 8, 2015
SB210 Enrolled September 9, 2015
SB210 Amended August 28, 2015
SB210 Amended July 16, 2015
SB210 Amended July 1, 2015
SB210 Amended June 2, 2015
SB210 Amended May 6, 2015
SB210 Amended April 20, 2015
SB210 Amended March 24, 2015
SB210 Introduced February 11, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB210 Chaptered October 8, 2015
SB210 Enrolled September 9, 2015
SB210 Amended August 28, 2015
SB210 Amended July 16, 2015
SB210 Amended July 1, 2015
SB210 Amended June 2, 2015
SB210 Amended May 6, 2015
SB210 Amended April 20, 2015
SB210 Amended March 24, 2015
SB210 Introduced February 11, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare