Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | April 22 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2015 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | March 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2015 | Set for hearing March 18. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2015 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |