Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
Returned to Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
June 21 set for final hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2015
|
July 14 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2015
|
June 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 1. Page 1020.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2015
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 729.) (April 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2015
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|