LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB220
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB220
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB220
Action History
Senate
02/01/2016
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Senate
04/22/2015
Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
Senate
04/20/2015
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Senate
02/26/2015
Referred to Com. on RLS.
Senate
02/13/2015
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
Senate
02/12/2015
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.