California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB222 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2015

Enrolled

Bill June 30, 2015

Chaptered

Bill July 13, 2015

Amended

Bill May 19, 2015
Bill April 15, 2015