Senate | 02/01/2016 | Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 06/04/2015 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Liu. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2015 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2015 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1149.) (May 28). | ||
Senate | 05/23/2015 | Set for hearing May 28. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | April 20 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2015 | Set for hearing April 20. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 507.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Set for hearing April 7. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |