California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB226 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2015

Amended

Bill September 3, 2015
Bill September 1, 2015
Bill August 17, 2015
Bill May 5, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015