LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB228
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB228
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB228
Action History
Senate
02/01/2016
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Senate
04/06/2015
April 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Senate
03/18/2015
Set for hearing April 14.
Senate
02/26/2015
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
Senate
02/17/2015
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
Senate
02/13/2015
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.